Multiplication - Two Digit By Two Carrying (Hard) #1 Question Preview (ID: 38488)


Multiplication - Two Digit By Two Digit (no Zeros).

58 x 11 =
a) 638
b) 738
c) 658
d) 758

32 x 19 =
a) 788
b) 608
c) 658
d) 618

75 x 95 =
a) 7,135
b) 7,125
c) 8,125
d) 7,165

46 x 41 =
a) 2,886
b) 1,881
c) 1,786
d) 1,886

29 x 68 =
a) 1,972
b) 1,982
c) 1,882
d) 1,984

28 x 96 =
a) 2,788
b) 2,688
c) 2,998
d) 2,698

41 x 59 =
a) 2,619
b) 1,419
c) 2,519
d) 2,419

49 x 33 =
a) 1,617
b) 1,517
c) 1,527
d) 1,717

41 x 34 =
a) 1,494
b) 1,284
c) 1,394
d) 4,394

43 x 75 =
a) 3,235
b) 3,225
c) 3,425
d) 3,245

Play Games with the Questions above at ReviewGameZone.com
To play games using the questions from above, visit ReviewGameZone.com and enter game ID number: 38488 in the upper right hand corner or click here.

TEACHERS / EDUCATORS
Log In
| Sign Up / Register