Multiplication-B Question Preview (ID: 21958)


Multiplication Of Double Digits Times Single Digits.[print questions]

27x12
a) 325
b) 324
c) 320
d) 322

39x67=
a) 2503
b) 2603
c) 2513
d) 2613

54x41=
a) 2210
b) 2214
c) 2213
d) 2014

92x13=
a) 1196
b) 1186
c) 1096
d) 1996

35x64=
a) 2230
b) 2220
c) 2240
d)

89x40=
a) 3660
b) 3560
c) 2660
d) 3550

19x84=
a) 1496
b) 1486
c) 1586
d) 1596

76x15=
a) 1140
b) 1150
c) 1160
d) 1130

11x23=
a) 243
b) 253
c) 233
d) 263

44x28
a) 1222
b) 1231
c) 1242
d) 1232

Play Games with the Questions above at ReviewGameZone.com
To play games using the questions from above, visit ReviewGameZone.com and enter game ID number: 21958 in the upper right hand corner or click here.

TEACHERS / EDUCATORS
Log In
| Sign Up / Register