Multiplication Practice Question Preview (ID: 12775)


Two And Three Digit Multiplication Problems.

325 x 67 =
a) 21,775
b) 21,777
c) 1,950
d) 2,275

45 x 98 =
a) 4,410
b) 405
c) 360
d) 441

68 x 23 =
a) 1,564
b) 1,465
c) 1,654
d) 1,456

655 x 9 =
a) 5,895
b) 5,598
c) 5,985
d) 5,558

921 x 56 =
a) 51,576
b) 51,765
c) 51,756
d) 52,567

457 x 83 =
a) 37,931
b) 37,913
c) 39,731
d) 39,137

568 x 55 =
a) 31,240
b) 3,124
c) 31,420
d) 31,020

789 x 67 =
a) 52,863
b) 52,638
c) 52,338
d) 5,286

79 x 79 =
a) 6,241
b) 6,412
c) 6,421
d) 6,142

235 x 99 =
a) 23,265
b) 23,655
c) 23,456
d) 23,625

Play Games with the Questions above at ReviewGameZone.com
To play games using the questions from above, visit ReviewGameZone.com and enter game ID number: 12775 in the upper right hand corner or click here.

TEACHERS / EDUCATORS
Log In
| Sign Up / Register